PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01325
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended up to and including 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 7/03/2019. (zad)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Seabrook, April)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Seabrook, April)
June 24, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/26/2019. (zjd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Defendant's Responsive Pleading shall be due on or before June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/21/2019. (lcapm3)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Seabrook, April)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Jenkins, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6108080) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons AG summons, #3 Summons Agency Summons, #4 Summons USAO summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/8/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Peter T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?