CRAVENS v. PACT, INC

Plaintiff: CASSANDRA CRAVENS
Defendant: PACT, INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01357
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by PACT, INC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scotti, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PACT, INC with Jury Demand filed by CASSANDRA CRAVENS. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (redline))(Hyman, Neil)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PACT, INC (Scotti, Brian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PACT, INC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scotti, Brian)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PACT, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET (Revised) by CASSANDRA CRAVENS filed by CASSANDRA CRAVENS.(Hyman, Neil) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/14/2019) (zef, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PACT, INC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6115923) filed by CASSANDRA CRAVENS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hyman, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAVENS v. PACT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACT, INC
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA CRAVENS
Represented By: Neil Stuart Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?