SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOURO INFIRMARY, H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER and SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01366
Filed: May 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 27 joint status report and the plaintiffs' 28 notice, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the case shall continue to be stayed. The government shall file its anticipated motion for consolidation on or before August 2, 2019. If the government's motion is granted, the parties shall take further action as directed in the consolidated case. Otherwise, the parties shall file a further joint status report within thirty days of any denial of the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01150-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC, 1:19-cv-01600-CRC(lccrc1)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 8/2/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(lsj)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #11 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and said pleading was filed in the correct case. (ztd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(Orloff, Serena) Modified on 6/13/2019 (ztd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC(Orloff, Serena)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has before it fifteen cases that have been consolidated and stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. The Court directed the parties to file a joint status report within thirty (30) days of the Supreme Court's decision in that case. The Supreme Court issued its decision in Allina Health Services on June 3, 2019. So that it does not receive fifteen separate status reports, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a single consolidated joint status report reflecting the views of all plaintiffs in the consolidated case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC(lccrc1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/22/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/20/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Cases consolidated. Cases 19cv1366 and 18cv222 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 5/15/19. From this date forward, all future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222 The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(ztd)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case, 19-cv-1366, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. It is further ORDERED that the consolidated case will remain stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/15/2019. (lccrc1)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests CORRECTED by H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOURO INFIRMARY (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by TOURO INFIRMARY, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL re #1 Complaint,, filed by TOURO INFIRMARY, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO INFIRMARY, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL.(Marcus, Kenneth)
May 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-2171. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 12, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOURO INFIRMARY (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6118018) filed by TOURO INFIRMARY, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #5 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, #6 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHENS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOURO INFIRMARY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. GOODALL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?