YOUNG v. FOLEY et al

Plaintiff: CORRETTA YOUNG
Defendant: DONNA LEWIS, MICHAEL B. THORNTON, TINA BUCKLER, JANET BOYER, ROBERT R. DI TROLIO, JOHN O. COLVIN, JUSTINE MILES, JAMES OREFICE, MAURICE B. FOLEY and EILEEN FOOTER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01373
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by CORRETTA YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - ECF Registration Form)(zrdj)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CORRETTA YOUNG (ztd)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (12) Issued as to JANET BOYER, TINA BUCKLER, JOHN O. COLVIN, ROBERT R. DI TROLIO, MAURICE B. FOLEY, EILEEN FOOTER, DONNA LEWIS, JUSTINE MILES, JAMES OREFICE, MICHAEL B. THORNTON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #3 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/29/19. (DJS)
May 28, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/22/2019. (zrdj)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by CORRETTA YOUNG (zsb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CORRETTA YOUNG (zsb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CORRETTA YOUNG. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
May 10, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/10/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. FOLEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B. THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TINA BUCKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET BOYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. DI TROLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN O. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTINE MILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES OREFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURICE B. FOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EILEEN FOOTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORRETTA YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?