GREGORY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Ryan Gregory and RYAN M. GREGORY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01385
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Berman, Joshua)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Berman, Joshua)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, included in Plaintiff's #5 Errata filing, it is hereby ORDERED that Attorney Peter Cameron is admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/17/2019. (lctjk1)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA Amended motion pro hac vice with language complying with local rules by RYAN M. GREGORY #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter Cameron, :Firm- Law Offices of Peter Cameron, :Address- 4003 Wabash Avenue, San Diego, CA 92104. Phone No. - 619-819-5021. Fax No. - 619-330-3513 Filing fee $ 100, rec filed by RYAN M. GREGORY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration amended declaration to comply with local rules, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Cameron does not categorically certify that he "either has or has not been disciplined by any bar" as required by LCvR 83.2(d)(4). Rather, he represents only that he is "in good standing" with all bars to which he is admitted. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/16/2019. (lctjk1)
May 16, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (zef, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA with addresses by Ryan Gregory #1 Complaint, filed by Ryan Gregory. (Berman, Joshua)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter Cameron, :Firm- Law Offices of Peter Cameron, :Address- 4003 Wabash Avenue, San Diego, CA 92104. Phone No. - 619-819-5021. Fax No. - 619-330-3513 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6122142. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Ryan Gregory (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of pro hac vice application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Joshua)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6122028) filed by Ryan Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Department of Navy, #2 Summons to United States Attorneys Office, #3 Summons to United States Attorney)(Berman, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREGORY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gregory
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN M. GREGORY
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Berman
Represented By: Peter Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?