FRIENDS OF ANIMALS et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT and BUFFALO FIELD CAMPAIGN
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Not Yet Classified: FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01403
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 5/29/2019 (Harris, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 5/29/2019 (Harris, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/28/2019. (Harris, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/29/19. (Harris, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-1909. (Harris, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DAVID BERNHARDT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6125500) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Harris, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUFFALO FIELD CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?