BUZZFEED INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: BUZZFEED INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE and U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND
Case Number: 1:2019cv01410
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND served on 6/10/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (jth)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 8/1/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/27/19. (DJS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Valdez, Darrell)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of All Defendants (Valdez, Darrell)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr on behalf of U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND (Martens, Roberto)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Re-Issued Electronically as to U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND. (ztd) Modified on 6/21/2019 (znmw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by BUZZFEED INC..(Topic, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2019. (Topic, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/2019. (Topic, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 5/31/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/29/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 5/30/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6126288) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUZZFEED INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ARMY MEDICAL RESEARCH AND MATERIEL COMMAND
Represented By: Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr.
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUZZFEED INC.
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?