T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC. v. CISSNA et al
Plaintiff: T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Defendant: LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01417
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Per Plaintiff's #10 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/13/2019. (lcjeb1)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC. (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI served on 5/28/2019 (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 5/22/2019 (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. L. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 5/22/2019 (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2019. (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/22/2019. (Pelta, Eleanor)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KEVIN MCALEENAN, LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC. filed by T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC..(Pelta, Eleanor)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Defendant Cissna filed by T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Defendant McAleenan, #2 Summons Defendant Zuchowski, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons United States Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Pelta, Eleanor)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6126730) filed by T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pelta, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC. v. CISSNA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. ROWE PRICE ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Eleanor Pelta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?