BOLTON v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: SUZY BOLTON
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv01435
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further action from the Court or transfer by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties are relieved of any pleading, discovery, or other obligation until further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pending a ruling on such transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 14, 2019. (lcrc2)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coots Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(Coots, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SUZY BOLTON. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-1348 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6130251) filed by SUZY BOLTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLTON v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZY BOLTON
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?