SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL, CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK, REX HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC., LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS and CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01446
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 8/6/2019. Response to #10 due by 7/24/2019. (zcdw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's answer to the complaint is due August 6, 2019. Notwithstanding, Plaintiffs' opposition to #10 Defendant's motion to stay is due July 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/11/2019. (lcrmc3)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Humphreys, Bradley). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 7/12/2019 (znmw).
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Humphreys, Bradley)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/24/2019 (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2019. (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/24/2019. (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zrdj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS, MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC., NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL, REX HOSPITAL, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK, THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-0132. (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS, MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC., NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL, REX HOSPITAL, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK, THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-2841. (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS, MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC., NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL, REX HOSPITAL, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK, THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL (Ruskin, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6131969) filed by LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL, KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL, CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, REX HOSPITAL, MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC., NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Azar Summons, #5 Summons Barr Summons, #6 Summons Liu Summons)(Ruskin, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENMORE MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL DU PAGE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWESTERN LAKE FOREST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, NEW YORK
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET R. PARDEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT ST. MARY's HOSPITAL OF NIAGARA FALLS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CARE CENTERS
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?