CONGRESS v. MCWILLIAMS

Plaintiff: ROGER CONGRESS and ROGER A. CONGRESS
Defendant: Chairperson of FDIC Jelena McWilliams and JELENA MCWILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01453
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JELENA MCWILLIAMS served on 5/28/2019 (Shapiro, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2019. (Shapiro, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/19. (Shapiro, David)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/30/2019. (DM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JELENA MCWILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
May 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jelena McWilliams with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6132134), CIVIL COVER SHEET by ROGER CONGRESS filed by ROGER CONGRESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shapiro, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONGRESS v. MCWILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER CONGRESS
Represented By: David H. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER A. CONGRESS
Represented By: David H. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairperson of FDIC Jelena McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JELENA MCWILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?