SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, EDWARD J. MANKO, RODERICK S. BASHIR, APRIL VERRETT, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, STEPHEN ABRECHT, EMANUEL PASTREICH, KEVIN MCGARR, JOHN J. SHERIDAN and FRANK A. MAXSON
Defendant: SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A FRUITVALE HEALTHCARE CENTER, SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A EXCELL HEALTHCARE CENTER, SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A DIAMOND RIDGE HEALTHCARE CENTER, SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP and SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01456
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or other response by August 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/16/2019. (lcabj3)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niccolini, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint or other response by July 17, 2019. The parties may contact chambers at any time if they are in agreement that they would benefit from the assistance of a neutral mediator. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/07/2019. (lcabj3)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niccolini, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019; SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 (Thuell, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP, SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A EXCELL HEALTHCARE CENTER, SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A FRUITVALE HEALTHCARE CENTER, SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A DIAMOND RIDGE HEALTHCARE CENTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6133121) filed by JOHN J. SHERIDAN, EDWARD J. MANKO, STEPHEN ABRECHT, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, FRANK A. MAXSON, APRIL VERRETT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, INGA CRAREY, KEVIN MCGARR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EMANUEL PASTREICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Thuell, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA CRAREY
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL VERRETT
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ABRECHT
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGARR
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC BEVERLY HILLS OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A FRUITVALE HEALTHCARE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC CLINTON TOWNSHIP OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A EXCELL HEALTHCARE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC FENTON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC CLAWSON OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP D/B/A DIAMOND RIDGE HEALTHCARE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC OAKLAND CAMBRIDGE OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC OAKLAND EXCELL OPERATING COMPANY, LP
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC OAKLAND FRUITVALE OPERATING COMPANY, LP
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC PITTSBURG OPERATING COMPANY, LP
Represented By: Robert R. Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?