MARTINEZ v. ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP.
Plaintiff: Omayra Martinez
Defendant: ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP. and ENTERCOM
Case Number: 1:2019cv01490
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP..(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
June 24, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arinderjit Dhali on behalf of OMAYRA MARTINEZ (Dhali, Arinderjit)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court will grant defendant's #5 motion for an extension to file an answer to the complaint or other response by July 9, 2019, notwithstanding plaintiff's objection to length of the extension. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/14/2019. (lcabj3)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Errata, #1 Complaint, by ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (Brown, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Complaint by OMAYRA MARTINEZ #1 Complaint, filed by OMAYRA MARTINEZ. (Brown, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6138075) filed by Omayra Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cvr Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Brown, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/22/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ v. ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERCOM COMMUNICATIONS CORP.
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERCOM
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omayra Martinez
Represented By: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: Arinderjit Dhali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?