HAWKINS et al v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., CASEY LEE MILLER, TROY BROOKS, RANDALL KIZER, VINCENT HILL, MARGARET JACOBS, E. MARTIN KERNS, JANET G. MELSNESS, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD., NBCC, LLC, MARY NICHOLSON, AGRI WATER, LLC, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, THERESA COWAN, CATHERINE A. MILLER, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, JENNIFER NEWMAN, ROGER NICHOLSON, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, DAVID COWAN, KEVIN NEWMAN, DARRELL W. JACOBS, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC, BARBARA A. DUARTE, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, ERIC LEE DUARTE, JOHN B. OWENS, TRACEY BROOKS, JACOX RANCHES, LLC, MARTIN NICHOLSON and GERALD H. HAWKINS
Defendant: BRYAN MERCIER, DARRYL LACOUNTE, TARA KATUK MAC LEAN SWEENEY and DAVID L. BERNHARDT
Case Number: 1:2019cv01498
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Damien M. Schiff. Mr. Damien M. Schiff, Esq. may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 19, 2019. (lcbah3)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Deerson. Mr. David J. Deerson, Esq. may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 19, 2019. (lcbah3)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Damien M. Schiff, :Firm- Pacific Legal Foundation, :Address- 930 G Street, Sacramento, California 95814. Phone No. - 916-419-7111. Fax No. - 916-419-7747 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6265865. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGRI WATER, LLC, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, TRACEY BROOKS, TROY BROOKS, DAVID COWAN, THERESA COWAN, DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., BARBARA A. DUARTE, ERIC LEE DUARTE, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, GERALD H. HAWKINS, VINCENT HILL, DARRELL W. JACOBS, MARGARET JACOBS, JACOX RANCHES, LLC, E. MARTIN KERNS, RANDALL KIZER, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, JANET G. MELSNESS, CASEY LEE MILLER, CATHERINE A. MILLER, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, NBCC, LLC, JENNIFER NEWMAN, KEVIN NEWMAN, MARTIN NICHOLSON, MARY NICHOLSON, ROGER NICHOLSON, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, JOHN B. OWENS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carollo, Dominic)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Deerson, :Firm- Pacific Legal Foundation, :Address- 930 G Street, Sacramento, California 95814. Phone No. - 916-419-7111. Fax No. - 916-419-7747 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6265791. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGRI WATER, LLC, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, TRACEY BROOKS, TROY BROOKS, DAVID COWAN, THERESA COWAN, DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., BARBARA A. DUARTE, ERIC LEE DUARTE, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, GERALD H. HAWKINS, VINCENT HILL, DARRELL W. JACOBS, MARGARET JACOBS, JACOX RANCHES, LLC, E. MARTIN KERNS, RANDALL KIZER, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, JANET G. MELSNESS, CASEY LEE MILLER, CATHERINE A. MILLER, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, NBCC, LLC, JENNIFER NEWMAN, KEVIN NEWMAN, MARTIN NICHOLSON, MARY NICHOLSON, ROGER NICHOLSON, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, JOHN B. OWENS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carollo, Dominic)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/12/2019. (Carollo, Dominic)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 13, 2019. (Carollo, Dominic)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Jessie K. Liu filed by DAVID COWAN, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, KEVIN NEWMAN, NBCC, LLC, CASEY LEE MILLER, TROY BROOKS, GERALD H. HAWKINS, TRACEY BROOKS, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, E. MARTIN KERNS, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD., CATHERINE A. MILLER, MARGARET JACOBS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, ERIC LEE DUARTE, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, MARY NICHOLSON, JANET G. MELSNESS, VINCENT HILL, MARTIN NICHOLSON, JENNIFER NEWMAN, DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., RANDALL KIZER, DARRELL W. JACOBS, AGRI WATER, LLC, JOHN B. OWENS, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, JACOX RANCHES, LLC, ROGER NICHOLSON, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, THERESA COWAN, BARBARA A. DUARTE, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons William P. Barr)(Carollo, Dominic)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 29, 2019. (lcbah3)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID L. BERNHARDT, DARRYL LACOUNTE, BRYAN MERCIER, TARA KATUK MAC LEAN SWEENEY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AGRI WATER, LLC, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, TRACEY BROOKS, TROY BROOKS, DAVID COWAN, THERESA COWAN, DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., BARBARA A. DUARTE, ERIC LEE DUARTE, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, GERALD H. HAWKINS(AS TRUSTEE OF THE CN HAWKINS TRUST AND GERALD H. HAWKINS AND CAROL H. HAWKINS TRUST), GERALD H. HAWKINS(INDIVIDUALLY), VINCENT HILL, DARRELL W. JACOBS, MARGARET JACOBS, JACOX RANCHES, LLC, E. MARTIN KERNS, RANDALL KIZER, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, JANET G. MELSNESS, CASEY LEE MILLER, CATHERINE A. MILLER, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, NBCC, LLC, JENNIFER NEWMAN, KEVIN NEWMAN, MARTIN NICHOLSON(INDIVIDUALLY), MARTIN NICHOLSON(AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLSON LOVING TRUST), MARY NICHOLSON, ROGER NICHOLSON, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, JOHN B. OWENS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD. (zef, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Action for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6141014) filed by DAVID COWAN, BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC, KEVIN NEWMAN, NBCC, LLC, CASEY LEE MILLER, GERALD H. HAWKINS(AS TRUSTEE OF THE CN HAWKINS TRUST AND GERALD H. HAWKINS AND CAROL H. HAWKINS TRUST), TROY BROOKS, GERALD H. HAWKINS(INDIVIDUALLY), TRACEY BROOKS, FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS, E. MARTIN KERNS, WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD., CATHERINE A. MILLER, MARGARET JACOBS, RASCAL RANCH, LLC, ERIC LEE DUARTE, GEOFFREY T. MILLER, MARY NICHOLSON, JANET G. MELSNESS, VINCENT HILL, MARTIN NICHOLSON(INDIVIDUALLY), JENNIFER NEWMAN, DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P., RANDALL KIZER, DARRELL W. JACOBS, AGRI WATER, LLC, JOHN B. OWENS, NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC, MARTIN NICHOLSON(AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE NICHOLSON LOVING TRUST), JACOX RANCHES, LLC, ROGER NICHOLSON, HARLOWE RANCH, LLC, THERESA COWAN, BARBARA A. DUARTE, GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Summons David L. Bernhardt, #4 Summons Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, #5 Summons Darryl Lacounte, #6 Summons Bryan Mercier)(Carollo, Dominic) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/23/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWKINS et al v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE MARTIN RANCHES, L.P.
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY LEE MILLER
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY BROOKS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL KIZER
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT HILL
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET JACOBS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. MARTIN KERNS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET G. MELSNESS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILKS RANCH OREGON, LTD.
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBCC, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY NICHOLSON
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGRI WATER, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN J. MELSNESS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASCAL RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA COWAN
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE A. MILLER
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLOWE RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER NEWMAN
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER NICHOLSON
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES LAKE COUNTY, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID COWAN
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN NEWMAN
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL W. JACOBS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOFFREY T. MILLER
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOSE NEST RANCHES, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. DUARTE
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLSON INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC LEE DUARTE
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN B. OWENS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BROOKS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOX RANCHES, LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN NICHOLSON
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD H. HAWKINS
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN MERCIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARRYL LACOUNTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA KATUK MAC LEAN SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?