CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Case Number: 1:2019cv01507
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by July 29, 2019, the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report that includes a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 15, 2019. (lcrc2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Bickford, James)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/12/2019. (tj)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Defendants shall respond to the complaint by July 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 27, 2019. (lcrc2)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Bickford, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/17/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re National Railroad Passenger Corporation with prejudice (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY served on 5/28/2019; NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 5/28/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/28/2019; WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 5/28/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6142017) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., #5 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #6 Summons DOI, #7 Summons USDA, #8 Summons DOC, #9 Summons DOEd, #10 Summons HHS, #11 Summons DHS, #12 Summons DOJ, #13 Summons State, #14 Summons Treasury, #15 Summons DOT, #16 Summons EPA, #17 Summons OMB, #18 Summons CIGIE, #19 Summons Amtrak)(Mulvey, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Mulvey
Represented By: Lee A. Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?