SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT, TARA SWEENEY, JOHN TAHSUDA, III, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and JOHN TAHSUDA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01544
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Antonacci Hadjigeorgiou on behalf of DAVID BERNHARDT, TARA SWEENEY, JOHN TAHSUDA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Hadjigeorgiou, Claudia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2019. (Bergin, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (jf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2019. (Bergin, Patrick) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jf).
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 6, 2019. (Bergin, Patrick) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jf).
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TARA SWEENEY served on 5/30/2019 (Bergin, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 5/30/2019 (Bergin, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/30/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/30/2019 (Bergin, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN TAHSUDA served on 5/30/2019 (Bergin, Patrick)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons for AG)(jf)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlinda F Locklear on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Locklear, Arlinda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bergin, Patrick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, TARA SWEENEY, JOHN TAHSUDA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6146519) filed by SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bergin, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/28/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Claudia Antonacci Hadjigeorgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA SWEENEY
Represented By: Claudia Antonacci Hadjigeorgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN TAHSUDA, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Claudia Antonacci Hadjigeorgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN TAHSUDA
Represented By: Claudia Antonacci Hadjigeorgiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS
Represented By: Patrick Robert Bergin
Represented By: Arlinda F Locklear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?