HENDERSON v. ACOSTA
Plaintiff: DAE HENDERSON
Defendant: MELBA ACOSTA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01566
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Relief from Order by DAE HENDERSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case without prejudice. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zeg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAE HENDERSON (zeg).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MELBA ACOSTA filed by DAE HENDERSON. (Attachment: #1 Memorandum in Support)(zeg)
May 23, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/23/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDERSON v. ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAE HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELBA ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?