WARBINGTON v. HARRIS TEETER, INC.

Plaintiff: GARRETT MARCELL WARBINGTON
Defendant: HARRIS TEETER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01585
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #7 due by 8/5/2019. (dot)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order advising plaintiff to respond by August 5, 2019, to defendant's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, for a more definite statement, or risk dismissal of the case based on defendant's assertions supporting the motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/1/19.(ah)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, For a More Definite Statement and Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by HARRIS TEETER, INC. (Hoffman, Joshua). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 6/28/2019 (znmw).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/10/19. (DM)
June 5, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY re #5 Errata. Documents must have the heading,case caption & the body should spell out the basis for the Errata. The corrected doc. is an attachment. (ztd, ) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ztd). Modified to enter in error on 6/6/2019; please disregard. (znmw).
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by HARRIS TEETER, INC. #4 Notice to Counsel/Party. (Hoffman, Joshua) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ztd). Modified to remove "entered in error" on 6/6/2019 (znmw).
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Hoffman on behalf of HARRIS TEETER, INC. (Hoffman, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HARRIS TEETER, INC. (Hoffman, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019CA2681 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6153733 filed by HARRIS TEETER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #2 Superior Court Documents Initial Order and Addendum, #3 Superior Court Documents Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit SCC Business Entity Details, #5 Superior Court Documents Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARBINGTON v. HARRIS TEETER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS TEETER, INC.
Represented By: Joshua M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRETT MARCELL WARBINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?