CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01607
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 6/11/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 6/11/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Bennett, Elise)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Bennett, Elise)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Collette L. Adkins is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/11/2019. (lckbj1)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/5/2019. (lckbj1)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zjd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Collette L. Adkins, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- P.O. Box 595, Circle Pines, MN 55014-0595. Phone No. - (651) 955-3821. Fax No. - (520) 623-9797 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6160333. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Collette L. Adkins, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bennett, Elise)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Bennett, Elise)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6160015) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bernhardt, #3 Summons USFWS, #4 Summons Attorney General Barr, #5 U.S. Attorney Liu)(Bennett, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Collette L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?