TARTT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DERRICK B. TARTT
Defendant: SHELDON NAGELBERG, MANAHAR AWATRIMANI, ELIJAH MESHIAH, WILBUR ROSS, ERIC DREIBAND, JEFFREY COLE, A. FORRESTER, CYNTHIA VALUKAS, SAMUEL PARKS, DOTRESS REEVES, SUZANNE CONLON, JULIE JONES, PHIL WILLIAMS, NORTHWEST SUBURBAN ANESTESIOLOGIST LTD, A. LAUER, RICHARD POSNER, MAGNA HEALTH SYSTEMS, FRANK EASTERBROOK, PAM HANSFORD, KAMENSKY RUBINSTEIN HUCHMAN & DELOIT, STEVE MNUCHIN, NORTHWEST COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE, NADER BOZORGI, BRUCE CROWTHERS, RICHARD DOCKETT, JAMES KUBIC, ANN CLAIRE WILLIAMS, DUPAGE ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY CTR., AMBULATORY ANESTHESIOLOGIST OF CHICAGO, TREVOR DESILVA, KAREN WRANCHER, WILLIAM BARR, JOAN HUMPHREY LEFKOW, IL DEPART. OF HUMAN RIGHTS, JAMES BENNETT, CHERYL SANTILLI, DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MICHAEL KANNE, DELORES KENNEBREW, SUSAN HALING, ROBERT BARTOLONE, JAY KOIKEMEISTER, HEALTHCARE SERVICE CORPORATION (BLUE CROSS/BLUESHIELD), IL DEPT. OF INSURANCE, MCDERMOTT WILL & EMORY, JOHN ANDRESAK, JOANNE BRUZGUL, ANTOINETTE KWATENG, DAVID CARR, WILLIAM BAUER, LISA MADIGAN, ANDREW BRANIFF, DAVID UNKNOWN, JAY STEWART, JAMES CHILDS, JR, MICHAEL BROHMAN, PATRICK SHANAHAN, CEO CONTINENTAL ANESTHESIOLOGIST, DELORES PFIFFER, DONALD POCHYLY, JOHN DARRAH, BRIAN HUCKER, SCOTT HARRIS & SCOTUS CLERKS, CHARLES NORGLE, J. FENTON, AMA INSURANCE, ALEXANDER ACOSTA, PATRICK GOOKIN, JEFFREY LIEB, ROBERT DOW, JR., DIANE WOODS, IL DEPT. OF FINANCIAL AND PROFESSIONAL REG., IIANA ROVNER, 900 N. MICHIGAN SURGERY CTR., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BMO HARRIS BANK, WYVONNIA BRIDGEFORTH, RICHARD FIORE, JANET GRANGER, CCA RESTORATION, DAVID PIVNIK, STEVEN HERRICK, HEATHER HIGGINS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ARMY BOARD FOR CORRECTION OF MILITARY RECORDS, UNITED STATES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC. (USAA), DANIEL MANION, LESLIE SMITH, KENNETH RIPPLE, MARK ESPER, MICHAEL MARX, CHARLES WILSON, WILLIAM P. BARR and STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01615
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by HEALTHCARE SERVICE CORPORATION (BLUE CROSS/BLUESHIELD) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Molly)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Q. Campbell on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICE CORPORATION (BLUE CROSS/BLUESHIELD) (Campbell, Molly)
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID PIVNIK (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Hutson, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL BROHMAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adler, Gary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TREVOR DESILVA served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (tth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BMO HARRIS BANK served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; HEALTHCARE SERVICE CORPORATION (BLUE CROSS/BLUESHIELD) served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; UNITED STATES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC. (USAA) served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 (ztd) (Main Document 22 replaced on 7/30/2019 to correct page orientation) (tth).
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVEN HERRICK re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT by DERRICK B. TARTT. (tth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES KUBIC served on 6/10/2019. (tth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN ANDRESAK served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; NORTHWEST SUBURBAN ANESTESIOLOGIST LTD served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (tth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard J. Marsico on behalf of DAVID PIVNIK (Marsico, Leonard)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Michael Brohman's #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Brohman shall file a response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by August 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/1/2019. (lctjk1)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL BROHMAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adler, Gary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN HERRICK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lynn Rapp-Tully on behalf of STEVEN HERRICK (Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by BRIAN HUCKER, MCDERMOTT WILL & EMORY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1--2014 Am. Compl. (N.D. Ill.), #3 Exhibit 2--2016 Am. Compl. (N.D. Ill.), #4 Exhibit 3--Rogaczewski Decl.)(Rogaczewski, Joshua)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Rogaczewski on behalf of BRIAN HUCKER, MCDERMOTT WILL & EMORY (Rogaczewski, Joshua)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by 900 N. MICHIGAN SURGERY CTR., AMBULATORY ANESTHESIOLOGIST OF CHICAGO, NADER BOZORGI, PAM HANSFORD, JAY KOIKEMEISTER, MAGNA HEALTH SYSTEMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Courtney)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant David Pivnik's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Pivnik shall file a response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by August 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/27/2019. (lctjk1)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant 900 N. Michigan Surgery Center, Ambulatory Anesthesiologist of Chicago, Nader Bozorgi, Pam Hansford, Jay Koikemeister, and Magna Health Systems' #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that those Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/27/2019. (lctjk1)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Uncontested) by DAVID PIVNIK (Hutson, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Hutson on behalf of DAVID PIVNIK (Hutson, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MANAHAR AWATRIMANI served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019; ROBERT BARTOLONE served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019; JAMES BENNETT served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; WYVONNIA BRIDGEFORTH served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; JOANNE BRUZGUL served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; DAVID CARR served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; BRUCE CROWTHERS served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; TREVOR DESILVA served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019; J. FENTON served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; A. FORRESTER served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; STEVEN HERRICK served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; IL DEPART. OF HUMAN RIGHTS served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; IL DEPT. OF FINANCIAL AND PROFESSIONAL REG. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; IL DEPT. OF INSURANCE served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; JULIE JONES served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019; LISA MADIGAN served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; MCDERMOTT WILL & EMORY served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; SHELDON NAGELBERG served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; NORTHWEST COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; JAY STEWART served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; CYNTHIA VALUKAS served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019; PHIL WILLIAMS served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (tth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEXANDER ACOSTA served on 6/12/2019; ARMY BOARD FOR CORRECTION OF MILITARY RECORDS served on 6/14/2019; WILLIAM BAUER served on 6/6/2019; ANDREW BRANIFF served on 6/11/2019; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/11/2019; RICHARD DOCKETT served on 6/11/2019; PATRICK GOOKIN served on 6/6/2019; MICHAEL KANNE served on 6/6/2019; A. LAUER served on 6/6/2019; JEFFREY LIEB served on 6/7/2019; RICHARD POSNER served on 6/6/2019; KENNETH RIPPLE served on 6/6/2019; IIANA ROVNER served on 6/6/2019; SCOTT HARRIS & SCOTUS CLERKS served on 6/7/2019; PATRICK SHANAHAN served on 6/7/2019; ANN CLAIRE WILLIAMS served on 6/6/2019; DIANE WOODS served on 6/6/2019. (tth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVITS of Mailing by DERRICK B. TARTT. (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Reimbursement of Filing Fees by DERRICK B. TARTT. (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by DERRICK B. TARTT. (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File by DERRICK B. TARTT. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Disc.) (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DERRICK B. TARTT. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachment) (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616098401) with Jury Demand filed by DERRICK B. TARTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)
June 3, 2019 SUMMONS (96) Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TARTT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELDON NAGELBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANAHAR AWATRIMANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIJAH MESHIAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBUR ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC DREIBAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. FORRESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA VALUKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOTRESS REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE CONLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST SUBURBAN ANESTESIOLOGIST LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. LAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD POSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGNA HEALTH SYSTEMS
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK EASTERBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM HANSFORD
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMENSKY RUBINSTEIN HUCHMAN & DELOIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NADER BOZORGI
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE CROWTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DOCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KUBIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN CLAIRE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPAGE ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY CTR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBULATORY ANESTHESIOLOGIST OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR DESILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN WRANCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN HUMPHREY LEFKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IL DEPART. OF HUMAN RIGHTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL SANTILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KANNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELORES KENNEBREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN HALING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BARTOLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY KOIKEMEISTER
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICE CORPORATION (BLUE CROSS/BLUESHIELD)
Represented By: Molly Q. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IL DEPT. OF INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDERMOTT WILL & EMORY
Represented By: Joshua David Rogaczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ANDRESAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE BRUZGUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTOINETTE KWATENG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA MADIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW BRANIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES CHILDS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BROHMAN
Represented By: Gary Charles Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK SHANAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO CONTINENTAL ANESTHESIOLOGIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELORES PFIFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD POCHYLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DARRAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HUCKER
Represented By: Joshua David Rogaczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT HARRIS & SCOTUS CLERKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES NORGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. FENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK GOOKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY LIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DOW, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IL DEPT. OF FINANCIAL AND PROFESSIONAL REG.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IIANA ROVNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 900 N. MICHIGAN SURGERY CTR.
Represented By: Courtney R. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYVONNIA BRIDGEFORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET GRANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCA RESTORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PIVNIK
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Represented By: Leonard J. Marsico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN HERRICK
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Rapp-Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER HIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMY BOARD FOR CORRECTION OF MILITARY RECORDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES AUTOMOBILE ASSOC. (USAA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL MANION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH RIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ESPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MARX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK B. TARTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?