WYLIE v. DEUTSCHE BANK
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE
Defendant: 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235 and DEUTSCHE BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv01628
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Receipt on 07/26/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:19-cv-12209 sent by Eastern District of Michigan. (zrdj)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred to the USDC for the USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan, pursuant to the Court Order entered 07/03/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zeg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE; Type of Document Returned: #4 order. (zsb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE; Type of Document Returned: Docket sheet. (zsb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zmc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE re #1 Complaint (zsb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE (zeg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235, DEUTSCHE BANK filed by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg)
June 4, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/4/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYLIE v. DEUTSCHE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19727 APPOLINE ST. DETRIOT, MI. 48235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?