FARMER v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: AVIS FARMER
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO and AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Case Number: 1:2019cv01635
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 7101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 ERRATA Corrected Certificate of Service due to mail room error by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES #11 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES. (Milledge, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES. (Milledge, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re (8 in 1:19-cv-01634-RC) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (6 in 1:19-cv-01631-RC) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (7 in 1:19-cv-01635-RC) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AVIS FARMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1830. (Milledge, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/17/2019 (tj)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FOX/NEAL ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/18/19. (lcrc1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 1 - CA3178B, #2 Exhibit # 2 - CA3179B, #3 Exhibit # 3 - CA3196B, #4 Exhibit # 4 - Certification of Representative)(Milledge, Matthew)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Certificate of Service; emailed to matthew.milledge@afge.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please do not refile. In the future, the Certificate of Service should be filed with the pleading. (ztth, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES re #5 Notice of Appearance . (Milledge, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Whitmore Milledge on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES (Milledge, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #3 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Errata. (zef, )
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1631; 19-cv-1634. (Milledge, Matthew) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/7/2019) (zef, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Caption, Civil Cover Sheet by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. (Milledge, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/7/2019) (zef, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003196 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6164538 filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Related Case, No. 2019 CA 003178 B, #3 Exhibit Related Case, No. 2019 CA 003179 B, #4 Exhibit Certification of Representative)(Milledge, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARMER v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew Whitmore Milledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Represented By: Matthew Whitmore Milledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVIS FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?