ANDY NEAL LLC et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

Plaintiff: ANDREW NEAL and ANDY NEAL LLC
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv01666
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's #6 Withdrawal of his Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the June 21, 2019 deadline for parties to file a proposed briefing schedule is VACATED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/20/2019. (lctjk1)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by ANDY NEAL LLC, ANDREW NEAL re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ANDREW NEAL, ANDY NEAL LLC . (Piston, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Schaefer, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by June 21, 2019. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a status report informing the Court of their attempts to confer with Defendant by June 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., unless Defendant's counsel files an appearance in this action before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/18/2019. (lctjk1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by ANDY NEAL LLC, ANDREW NEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7. Neal, Andrew L1A Approval - 2018)(Piston, Michael); Modified event and text on 6/12/2019 (tth).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 6/20/2019..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANDY NEAL LLC, ANDREW NEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Petition to Extend A. Neal's L-1A Status in the U.S., #2 Exhibit 2. Request for Evidence, #3 Exhibit 3. ANL's response to the RFE, #4 Exhibit 4. Notice of Intent to Revoke, #5 Exhibit 5. Rebuttal of Notice of Intent to Revoke, #6 Exhibit 6. Notice of Revocation, #7 Memorandum in Support, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael); Modified text on 6/21/2019 (tth).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6172025) filed by ANDY NEAL LLC, ANDREW NEAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons USCIS)(Piston, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/10/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDY NEAL LLC et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW NEAL
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY NEAL LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?