FERGUSON v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff: TRACEY FERGUSON
Defendant: U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01689
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Dispositive Motion due by 8/19/2019. (tg)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER advising the plaintiff to respond by August 19, 2019 to the defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 18, 2019. (lcbah3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/17/2019. (tg)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2019. (lcbah3)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, over the plaintiff's objection, the defendant's #3 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for the good cause reasons outlined in the defendant's Motion. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by July 17, 2019, answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2019. (lcbah3)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 SC3 003022 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammond, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERGUSON v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?