EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION and VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01692
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Schaefer, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file his Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by October 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/8/2019. (lcjeb2)
August 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/15/2019 (lsj)
June 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/13/2019. (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/18/2019. (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR served on 6/17/2019 (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION, VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 15cv2251. (Lovitky, Jeffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/11/2019) (zef, ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION, VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6177813) filed by EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION, VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons US Attorney Summons, #4 Summons Attorney General Summons, #5 Summons HHS Summons)(Lovitky, Jeffrey) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/11/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lovitky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPIRE HEALTH FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lovitky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lovitky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?