PACE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: TANYA J. PACE
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01706
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Barnhart, Virginia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by TANYA J. PACE. (ztd)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order advising plaintiff to respond by 7/19/2019 to #14 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/20/19. (ms)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order advising the plaintiff to respond by 7/19/2019 to #7 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/18/19. (ms)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (jf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Meyer on behalf of SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC (Meyer, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia W. Barnhart on behalf of SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC (Barnhart, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Consent to Removal by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Virginia W. Barnhart on behalf of SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC Substituting for attorney Aaron D. Neal (Barnhart, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 2 to Supporting Memorandum, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Local Rule 7.1 Financial Disclosure by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Meyer on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Meyer, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia W. Barnhart on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC (Neal, Aaron)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 002901 R(RP) Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6181791 filed by SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Neal, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PACE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Meyer
Represented By: Virginia W. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Meyer
Represented By: Virginia W. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA J. PACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?