WEIR et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON and DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS
Defendant: KARL L. SCHULTZ and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01708
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Referring Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Complaint due by 9/26/2019. If a motion to dismiss is filed, the plaintiffs' opposition is due by 11/19/2019. (JK)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, the defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before September 26, 2019. If the defendants respond by filing a motion to dismiss in lieu of an answer, the plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before November 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 26, 2019. (JK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KARL L. SCHULTZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosa, Jill)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick N. Petrocelli. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 19, 2019. (JK)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah M. Roe. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 19, 2019. (JK)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua S. Sohn. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 19, 2019. (JK)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Watt. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 19, 2019. (JK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick N. Petrocelli, :Firm- Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP, :Address- 180 Maiden Lane New York, NY 10038. Phone No. - 212-806-5400. Fax No. - 212-806-6006 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6193109. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON, ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS (Hafetz, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah M. Roe, :Firm- Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP, :Address- 180 Maiden Lane New York, NY 10038. Phone No. - 212-806-5400. Fax No. - 212-806-6006 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6193073. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON, ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS (Hafetz, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua S. Sohn, :Firm- Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP, :Address- 180 Maiden Lane New York, NY 10038. Phone No. - 212-806-5400. Fax No. - 212-806-6006 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6193013. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON, ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS (Hafetz, Jonathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven M. Watt, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union, :Address- 125 Broad Street Suite 18. Phone No. - 212-549-2500. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6192796. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON, ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS (Hafetz, Jonathan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2019. (Spitzer, Arthur)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan as it is not a related case. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KARL L. SCHULTZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Assigned was entered in error and case will be directly assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson RE ECF docket entry No. 2. (zef, )
June 12, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 (zef, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-01388-KBJ. (Hafetz, Jonathan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6181996) filed by DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS, ROBERT DEXTER WEIR, LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON, PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hafetz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEIR et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DEXTER WEIR
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz
Represented By: Patrick N. Petrocelli
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Represented By: Joshua S. Sohn
Represented By: Sarah M. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK WAYNE FERGUSON
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz
Represented By: Patrick N. Petrocelli
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Represented By: Joshua S. Sohn
Represented By: Sarah M. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTHER FIAN PATTERSON
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz
Represented By: Patrick N. Petrocelli
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Represented By: Joshua S. Sohn
Represented By: Sarah M. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RODERICK WILLIAMS
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz
Represented By: Patrick N. Petrocelli
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Represented By: Joshua S. Sohn
Represented By: Sarah M. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL L. SCHULTZ
Represented By: Jill Dahlmann Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jill Dahlmann Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?