GREENE v. UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: LAUREN GREENE
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01742
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LAUREN GREENE (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's #3 "Motion for Electronic Access" is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that, within 30 days of entry of this Order, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. If the plaintiff wither fails to file an amended complaint timely or if her amended complaint fails to address the deficiencies identified above, the Court will dismiss this civil action for failure to prosecute (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/08/2019. (zad) Modified on 7/15/2019 to include the words memorandum opinion (zad).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite by LAUREN GREENE (zrdj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LAUREN GREENE (zrdj)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LAUREN GREENE (zmc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAUREN GREENE (zmc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL filed by LAUREN GREENE.(zmc)
June 14, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/14/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BALTIMORE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?