HELMER v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Plaintiff: PROFESSOR JOHN HELMER and JOHN HELMER
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01744
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's #8 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/9/2019. (lckbj1)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Taaffe, Damon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to Answer Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re #1 Complaint, #8 Order,, (Taaffe, Damon)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/10/2019 (Temkin, Maria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/8/2019. (Temkin, Maria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/09/2019. (Temkin, Maria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/8/2019. (lckbj1)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/24/2019 (Temkin, Maria)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Issue Summons to U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C. by JOHN HELMER (Temkin, Maria) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct docket text (jf).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Issue Summons to U.S. Attorney General by JOHN HELMER (Temkin, Maria) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct docket text (zjf).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Complaint by JOHN HELMER #1 Complaint, filed by JOHN HELMER. (Temkin, Maria)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN HELMER U.S.DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190093) filed by JOHN HELMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Temkin, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HELMER v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROFESSOR JOHN HELMER
Represented By: Maria Temkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HELMER
Represented By: Maria Temkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?