CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01750
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Taaffe, Damon)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer for the non-APA claims due by 8/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (zjd)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Proposed Stipulation and Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's APA Claims (Claims 5 and 6) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 7, are hereby stayed. Defendant's Answer for the non-APA claims shall be filed on or before August 14, 2019. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 13, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/30/2019. (lcapm3)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss in Part (Joint) and Proposed Scheduling Order by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss in Part by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Attachment A)(Lopes, Paulo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon)
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William John Snape, III on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Snape, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190872) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Summons DOJ AG, #4 Summons EPA, #5 Declaration Rule 26)(Lopes, Paulo) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Paulo Antonio Lopes
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?