AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01752
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2019. (tb)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 8/30/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/19. (DJS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Hammond, Derek)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Hammond, Derek)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/28/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Creighton, Sara)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) ReIssued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (ztd) Modified on 7/1/2019 (ztd).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Creighton, Sara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6192501) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to USAO, #3 Summons as to AG, #4 Summons as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Sara Kaiser Creighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?