PERVU et al v. CITY OF ONEONTA et al
Plaintiff: MELANIA PERVU and NICOLAE PERVU
Defendant: CITY OF ONEONTA and DAVID MERZIG
Case Number: 1:2019cv01754
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Receipt on 07/17/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 6:19-cv-00861 sent by Northern District of New York. (zrdj)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of New York, pursuant to the Court Order entered 06/24/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zrdj)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of New York. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/14/2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/24/2019. (zeg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MELANIA PERVU, NICOLAE PERVU (zrdj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF ONEONTA, DAVID MERZIG filed by MELANIA PERVU, NICOLAE PERVU.(zrdj)
June 17, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/17/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERVU et al v. CITY OF ONEONTA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ONEONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MERZIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIA PERVU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLAE PERVU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?