MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01759
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019. (zjd)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than September 3, 2019, updating the court on the status of settlement negotiations, unless the parties file a stipulation of dismissal prior to that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/02/2019.
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Hoppe, Jon)
June 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 7/31/2019. (zjd)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/18/2019. (lcapm1)
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Action involving Copyright Infringement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6194152) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Jon A. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?