DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION et al v. POMPEO et al

Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION and AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: DAVID FERRIERO, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01773
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 9/20/2019. (tg)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before September 20, 2019. Further extension requests will be disfavored. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/15/2019. (lctnm1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Wyer on behalf of DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Wyer, Kathryn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID FERRIERO served on 6/21/2019; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 6/21/2019; MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 6/24/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shah, Nitin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Shah, Nitin)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/19/2019. (lctnm1)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195576) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Shah, Nitin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FERRIERO
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?