BLANCHETTE v. DEVOS et al

Plaintiff: TAMARA BLANCHETTE
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01775
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/19/2019; Responses due by 10/24/2019; Replies due by 11/14/2019. (tj)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until September 19, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's opposition to that motion is due by October 24, 2019, and Defendants' reply in support of that motion is due by November 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 16, 2019. (lcrc3)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set a Briefing Schedule by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloom, Karen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELISABETH DEVOS served on 6/24/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 6/24/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bitner, Robyn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by TAMARA BLANCHETTE. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Complaint)(Bitner, Robyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195960) filed by TAMARA BLANCHETTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bitner, Robyn) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLANCHETTE v. DEVOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS
Represented By: Karen Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Karen Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA BLANCHETTE
Represented By: Robyn K. Bitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?