GLASS v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: LEIGH GLASS
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01804
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret)
July 19, 2019 Filing 76 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret)
July 19, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Winslow Reed on behalf of NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Reed, Margaret)
June 20, 2019 Filing 74 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-02239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 19, 2019 Filing 73 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Columbia the electronic record. (mma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer #39 is granted. The Court transfers this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/4/2019. Mailed notice. (mma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill to motion to dismiss #39 (Reply in support of motion to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (United States v. Glass), #2 Exhibit B (11-2-18 Hearing Transcript))(Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: In light of appointed counsel's withdraw from this matter, the Court now addresses a number of motions currently pending before the Court. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #53 is granted. Plaintiff's renewed motion to recuse #54 is denied. Although 28 U.S.C. 455(a) requires a judge to disqualify herself if there is a reasonable basis to question her impartiality, this Court states that this Court can fairly and impartially decide this matter. The fact that this Court previously dismissed the case for want of prosecution and that ruling was vacated on appeal has no bearing on this Court's ability to be fair and impartial as the case moves forward for that is the role of the appellate court. Judicial rulings alone almost never constitute a valid basis for disqualification. Hoffman v. Caterpillar, Inc., 368 F.3d 709, 718 (7th Cir. 2004). Recusal under section 144 is only required upon a showing of actual bias. "Only personal animus or malice on the part of the judge can establish bias." Fairley v. Andrews, 423 F. Supp. 2d 800, 803 (N.D. Ill. 2006) (quoting Hoffman, 368 F.3d at 718). Plaintiff has not established personal animus or malice. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for extension 31 and motion to recuse #43 are denied as duplicative and moot. Due to plaintiff's medical condition, the Court appointed counsel to assist her. Despite appointed counsel's due diligence, appointed counsel was unable to communicate confidentially with plaintiff or to secure signature of his standard engagement letter. The Court cannot accommodate plaintiff if she is unwilling to avail herself of assistance. As indicated in its prior order, the Court will not appoint further counsel at this point. Therefore, Plaintiff's motions for extensions and vacating hearings #44 , #45 , #46 are denied. Docket entries #65 , #66 , and #67 each are signed "Legal Team of L. Glass." Plaintiff has represented to the Court that she is representing herself and proceeding pro se. The Court strikes docket entries #65 , #66 , #67 , #68 , and #69 on the basis of unauthorized practice of law. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Correction regarding #65 . (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass for sanctions AUSA and defendants. (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 67 1ST RECEIVED Amended Complaint and no copies by Leigh Glass (Exhibits). (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to stay, MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass for 30 day extension (Exhibits). (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to sanction AUSA and defendants. (kp, ) Modified on 5/15/2019 (kp, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 3/25/2019. Jim Goodfellow, of Seyfarth Shaw, appeared on behalf of appointed counsel Kenneth Roy Dolin, also of Seyfarth Shaw. Mr. Goodfellow detailed the continued thorough efforts that appointed counsel has engaged in to communicate directly with plaintiff since the last motion hearing. Plaintiff did not respond to additional contacts from appointed counsel. Appointed counsel undertook all reasonable efforts to communicate with plaintiff while being cognizant of his concerns regarding client confidentiality when contacting plaintiff through the provided email address because it is unclear whether plaintiff or a third party is monitoring the email account. Appointed counsel did not receive a response from plaintiff concerning this hearing or regarding Mr. Dolin's motion to withdraw. Neither was the Court contacted by plaintiff, who did not appear by person, by email, or by phone. Attorney Kenneth Dolin's motion to withdraw from assignment pursuant to Local Rule 83.38 #61 is granted. The Court thanks Mr. Dolin and Mr. Goodfellow for their diligent efforts to represent plaintiff in this matter. The court system will not be held hostage by an unknown, unavailable plaintiff, who despite her complaints regarding a lack of accommodation, does not provide the Court specifics regarding her alleged disability and requests extraordinary accommodations from the Court. The Court has sought to provide a series of options to plaintiff that would allow for communications with the Court, including the assistance of appointed counsel and communicating with the Court via phone or email. The Court is unaware of any recent attempts by plaintiff to avail herself of any of the opportunities provided by the Court, even though this is her second opportunity to proceed with this case. This Court will not appoint further counsel at this point. The lack of response from plaintiff in this litigation does not leave many options beyond moving forward, which is the ultimate goal of all involved with this case. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer #39 : plaintiff to file any opposition by 5/9/2019. Defendant to file a reply by 5/23/2019. Once fully briefed, defendant's motion will be taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/18/2019. Jim Goodfellow, of Seyfarth Shaw, appeared on behalf of appointed counsel Kenneth Roy Dolin, also of Seyfarth Shaw. Mr. Goodfellow detailed the thorough efforts that appointed counsel has engaged in to communicate directly with plaintiff and plaintiff's refusal to sign appointed counsel's standard engagement letter. Mr. Goodfellow also explained his concerns regarding client confidentiality when contacting plaintiff through the provided email address because it is unclear whether plaintiff or a third party is monitoring the email account. Appointed counsel last had contact with plaintiff last week when she called appointed counsel, and appointed counsel informed plaintiff regarding the motion to withdraw as counsel. Appointed counsel also informed plaintiff of this hearing date, and they did not receive a response from plaintiff regarding whether she desired to appear at the 2/18/2019 hearing. The last contact the Court's staff and defendant had with plaintiff was at the last status on 11/2/2018 when she appeared by telephone, although the Court herself attempted to confirm whether plaintiff was the individual who answered the telephone and continued the colloquy from there that led to the appointment of counsel. The Court called the case again at 9:45 AM, 45 minutes after the motion time, to give plaintiff every opportunity to appear by person, by email, and by phone. She did not appear. Motion by Kenneth Roy Dolin to withdraw from assignment pursuant to Local Rule 83.38 #61 is entered and continued to 3/25/2019. Plaintiff must either respond to the motion to withdraw from assignment or get in touch with appointed counsel by 3/14/2019. Status hearing will be held on 3/25/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth Roy Dolin for presentment of motion to withdraw from assignment pursuant to Local Rule 83.38 #61 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/21/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Dolin, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to withdraw from assignment pursuant to Local Rule 83.38 for Leigh Glass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dolin, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/2/18 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 32713. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019. (Mccullough, Tracey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Due to the general stay of all litigation involving the United States of America as a party, as established by Amended General Order 18-0028, the status hearing set for 1/22/2019 is stricken and reset for 2/21/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 57 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Due to the general stay of all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, as set by General Order 18-0028, the status hearing set for 1/7/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/22/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 54 RENEWED 2ND MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to recuse Judge Coleman (per 28 U.S.C 455 AND 144). (tt, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 53 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The Court recruits attorney Kenneth Roy Dolin, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 233 South Waacker Drive, Suite 8000, ChIcago, IL 60606, (312) 460-5000, kdolin@sayfarth.com to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligations under Local Rule 83.37 (N.D. Ill.). Counsel shall enter an appearance in this case at his earliest convenience. Status hearing set for 12/7/2018 is stricken and reset to 1/7/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/4/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 51 DECLARATION of L. Glass; (Attachment). (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: As stated on the record in open court on 11/2/2018 with plaintiff appearing by telephone, this Court will appoint counsel to assist her. However, the Court must first receive an updated in forma pauperis petition. The updated in forma pauperis petition must be filed before the next status on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Correction regarding #48 (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 11/2/2018. Plaintiff appeared by phone. The briefing schedule previously set by the court on Defendant's motion to dismiss #39 is stricken. Due to Plaintiff's medical condition, the Court will appoint counsel to assist her. Status hearing set for 12/7/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 48 DECLARATION of plaintiff re: (1) Lack of Notice & (2) A Complete Failure of Service (ek, ) (Main Document 48 replaced on 11/6/2018) (ek, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 46 EX Parte Application (1) Reqeust to vacate all future hearings & per law, rule on the briefs (2) request for clarification. by Plaintiff Leigh Glass(ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 45 URGENT EX Parte application for extension, continuance, and per A.D.A., requesting a reasonable accommodation for a disabled person; declaration of plaintiff filed by Leigh Glass. (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass OMNIBUS ex parte application requesting: (1) Court Vacate 11/2/2018 hearing due to impossibility & disability; and (2) R.60b reconsideration of stricken documents; (or, alternatively motion for clarification) (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to recuse Judge Coleman (per 28 U.S.C. 455 and 144); Declaration of plaintiff. (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/25/2018.Plaintiff did not appear. Response to Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer #39 to be filed by 11/23/2018. Reply to be filed by 12/7/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by Nancy A Berryhill re notice of motion #40 , MOTION by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer #39 (Amended Certificate of Service) (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Willoughby Anderson for presentment of motion to dismiss #39 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/25/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill to dismiss for improper venue or to transfer (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 11/2/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued submitted; Decided decided in USCA case no. 17-3138. (mma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 8/17/2018 regarding notice of appeal #26 ; USCA No. 17-3138. We VACATE the judgment and REMAND for further proceedings, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. Each side can bear its own costs on appeal. (mma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 35 MANDATE of USCA dated 10/9/2018 regarding notice of appeal #26 ; USCA No.17-3138 ; No record to be returned. (mma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER dated 06/08/2018 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #26 ; Appellate case no. : 17-3138; Upon consideration of the MOTION TO STAY, filed on June 5, 2018, by the pro se appellant, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. If the panel that resolves this appeal believes that the audio recording of the July 10, 2017, hearing is necessary, it can request that it be filed. (jk, ) Modified on 6/11/2018 (jk, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/18/17 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2018. (Mccullough, Tracey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dated 5/17/2018 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #26 ; Appellate case no. : 17-3138; IT IS ORDERED that the court reporter prepare the transcript of the hearing held on August 18, 2017. Because the appellant is proceeding in forma pauperis and the appeal presents a substantial question, the costs of the transcript shall be paid by the United States pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 753(f). (ew, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis #25 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/26/2017. Mailed notice (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #26 ; USCA Case No. 17-3138. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 28 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #26 . Notified counsel (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #26 (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of appeal by Leigh Glass regarding orders #18 , #23 (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court having received an email communication from the email address plaintiff provided to the Clerk's Office for receipt of electronic notices, purporting to be on behalf of pro se plaintiff, Leigh Glass, states: This Court's Standing Order, available to the public via the website for the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, directs that "All communications [with the Court] must be made in the form of a motion, brief, or a status report, properly noticed and served on opposing counsel." This Court's Standing Order also specifically states that "Requests to appear telephonically must be e-mailed to the Courtroom Deputy no later than one full business day prior to the hearing. The e-mail must include the case name and number, the date and time of the hearing, the name of the attorney seeking to appear by telephone, the name of the party he or she represents, and a direct telephone number where he or she can be reached when the case is called. The e-mail shall also briefly explain why a telephonic appearance is necessary and shall indicate if local counsel will also be appearing. Courtesy notice must be provided to all parties." In this instance, plaintiff made no such request and the Court had ordered her to appear for status hearing on 8/18/2017. This Court dismissed the case for want of prosecution based on the following history. Plaintiff failed to appear at the status hearing set for 6/2/2017. The Court admonished plaintiff that the failure to appear would result in dismissal for want of prosecution. Dkt. 18. At the status hearing on 7/10/2017, the Court advised plaintiff that she must update her application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and set the matter for status hearing on 8/18/2017, directing plaintiff to be present in open court at the next hearing or be prepared to advise the court why she is not present. Dkt. 19. Plaintiff did not file an updated in forma pauperis petition as Ordered. On 8/18/2017, plaintiff again failed to appear for status as directed. As a courtesy to her status as a pro se, during that hearing the Court made several attempts to contact plaintiff at the telephone number provided by plaintiff on the court's docket, which went to voicemail and appeared to be a business number. This Court then dismissed the case for want of prosecution based on plaintiff's failure to appear and failure to comply with Court orders. Mailed notice (rth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 24 REQUEST by Plaintiff for Clerk's entry of default (Exhibits) (Envelope postmark 08/15/2017). (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 8/18/2017. Plaintiff did not appear. The court made several attempts to contact plaintiff by telephone at the number given on the docket, to no avail. Defendant's oral motion to dismiss the case for want of prosecution is granted. The case is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 21 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 08/17/2017 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal ; Appellate case no. : 17-2681; IT IS ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. Mandamus is to be invoked only in extraordinary circumstances, Cheney v. U.S. Dist. Court for Dist. of Columbia, 542 U.S. 367, 380 (2004), and none are identified in this petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis and the motion to expedite are DENIED. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal ; USCA Case No. 17-2681. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 7/10/2017. Plaintiff to update her application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Status hearing set for 8/18/2017 at 09:30 AM. Plaintiff to be present in open court at the next hearing or be prepared to advise the court why she is not present.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Minute entry #17 dated 6/2/2017 is amended as follows: Status hearing held on 6/2/2017. Plaintiff did not appear. All pending motions #4 13 14 15 and 16 are stricken. Status hearing set for 7/10/2017 at 09:45 AM. If plaintiff fails to appear at the next hearing, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 6/2/2017. Plaintiff did not appear. All pending motions #4 13 [14} 15 16 . Status hearing set for 7/10/2017 at 09:45 AM. If plaintiff fails to appear at the next hearing, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE: defendant's filings served - albeit untimely by Leigh Glass. (Exhibit) (pk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion for more definite statement #8 is withdrawn. No appearance necessary on 5/18/2017.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill to Withdraw Motion for More Definite Statement #8 by Nancy A Berryhill (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Willoughby Anderson for presentment of motion for more definite statement #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/18/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Nancy A Berryhillfor more definite statement (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 6/2/2017 at 09:15 AM on plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The parties should promptly consult with each other on the following topics: 1) Agree to file consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge; 2) Do the parties agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner?, 3) If not, motions for summary judgment shall be briefed as follows: motion for summary judgment shall be filed within 60 days of the filing of the answer and administrative record. Response is due 45 days thereafter. Reply, if any, is due 14 days thereafter.Mailed notice (rth, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Susan Willoughby Anderson as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying fees or costs. (Attachments: #1 Order)(rm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Leigh Glass. (rm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Leigh Glass (Exhibits). (rm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLASS v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEIGH GLASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?