LEWIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MARC ANTHONY LEWIS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01808
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motion #4 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Edward A. Wicklund for MARC ANTHONY LEWIS added. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/22/19. (lsj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edward A. Wicklund, :Firm- Olinsky Law Group, :Address- 300 S. State Street, Ste. 420, Syracuse, NY 13202. Phone No. - 315-701-5780. Fax No. - 315-701-5781 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6241769. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARC ANTHONY LEWIS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shea, Stephen)
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zsb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (zmc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by MARC ANTHONY LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet), #2 Summons)(zmc).
June 19, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC ANTHONY LEWIS
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?