SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: TRINITY REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM BETTENDORF, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, IOWA METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER, IOWA LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL- WEST, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, BON SECOURS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HD GOODALL HOSPITAL, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ST. CHARLES HOSPITAL, METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER OF ILLINOIS, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOHN'S EPISCOPAL, ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, MILE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, FINLEY HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER CENTRALIA, CROUSE HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, BILLINGS CLINIC, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER and NYACK HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01829
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/27/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/28/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Cases consolidated. 19cv1829 CRC is consolidated with case Lead Case 18cv222 CRC, pursuant to Minute Order entered 7/10/19. All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that case 19-cv-1829 is CONSOLIDATED with consolidated case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (permitting sua sponte consolidation of cases presenting common questions of law or fact). All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/10/2019. (lccrc1) Modified on 7/10/2019 (zlsj).
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BILLINGS CLINIC, BON SECOURS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FINLEY HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, HD GOODALL HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, IOWA LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, IOWA METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER OF ILLINOIS, MILE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, NYACK HOSPITAL, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOHN'S EPISCOPAL, SAINT LUKE'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL- WEST, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER CENTRALIA, ST. CHARLES HOSPITAL, ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, TRINITY REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM BETTENDORF, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS HOSPITAL (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6206398) filed by IOWA METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER, IOWA LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MILE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, BILLINGS CLINIC, METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER OF ILLINOIS, NYACK HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CROUSE HOSPITAL, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, HD GOODALL HOSPITAL, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, TRINITY REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM BETTENDORF, SAINT JOHN'S EPISCOPAL, VASSAR BROTHERS HOSPITAL, MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, FINLEY HOSPITAL, ST. CHARLES HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL- WEST, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, BON SECOURS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER CENTRALIA, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #9 Summons ATTORNEY GENEAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #10 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITY REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM BETTENDORF
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOWA METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOWA LUTHERAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL- WEST
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BON SECOURS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HD GOODALL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CHARLES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METHODIST MEDICAL CENTER OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOHN'S EPISCOPAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FINLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER CENTRALIA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROUSE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASSAR BROTHERS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLINGS CLINIC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT MARY'S HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYACK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?