BURGESS v. JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS et al
Plaintiff: JOSPEH BURGESS, III and JOSEPH BURGESS, III
Defendant: KARLES C. JACKSON, SR. and JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01834
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service upon JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS and KARLES C. JACKSON, SR. on 6/28/19. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #4 to view.)
July 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Socci, Laurence)
July 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence Lauro Socci on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Socci, Laurence) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/8/2019) (ztd).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to KARLES C. JACKSON, SR, JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
June 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6206790) filed by JOSEPH BURGESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Karles Jackson Summons, #3 Summons Kennedy Center Summons)(Socci, Laurence) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/24/2019) (zef, ). Modified text on 6/24/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURGESS v. JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARLES C. JACKSON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. KENNEDY CENTER FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSPEH BURGESS, III
Represented By: Laurence Lauro Socci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BURGESS, III
Represented By: Laurence Lauro Socci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?