WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, BRISTOL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL and D C H REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01839
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/5/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/03/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/1/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Cases consolidated. 19cv1839 CRC is consolidated with case Lead Case 18cv222 CRC, pursuant to Minute Order entered 7/10/19. All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that case 19-cv-1839 is CONSOLIDATED with consolidated case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (permitting sua sponte consolidation of cases presenting common questions of law or fact). All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/10/2019. (lccrc1) Modified on 7/10/2019 (zlsj).
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BRISTOL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6207808) filed by JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BRISTOL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #12 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #13 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D C H REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?