BLACK et al v. MCALEENAN et al

Plaintiff: Patrick A Johnson, William F Walsh, Michael Woodworth, G Bruce Pharis, Terry L Hoxworth, John F Hein, Freddie J Black, Charles W Dick, Drue B Garrison, Harold B Gay, Paul J Coulon, Larry E Hunter, DRUE B. GARRISON, WILLIAM F. WALSH, PAUL J. COULON, CHARLES W. DICK, HAROLD B. GAY, LARRY E. HUNTER, PATRICK A. JOHNSON, FREDDIE J. BLACK, JOHN F. HEIN, G. BRUCE PHARIS and TERRY L. HOXWORTH
Defendant: Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K McAleenan, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN and U.S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01850
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR: Do not select "All Defendant". You must select the party/parties that was served. Entries have been modified by the Court. (ztd, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 (ztd). Modified text on 7/3/2019 (znmw).
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/1/2019. (Bernstein, Jules)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 1, 2019. (Bernstein, Jules)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Date of Service 6/28/19. (Bernstein, Jules) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (ztd).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. Date of Service 7/1/19. (Bernstein, Jules) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (ztd).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/1/2019. (DM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg).
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K McAleenan Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security and Commissioner, US Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6208314) filed by John F Hein, William F Walsh, Charles W Dick, Terry L Hoxworth, Patrick A Johnson, Michael Woodworth, Paul J Coulon, Larry E Hunter, Freddie J Black, Drue B Garrison, G Bruce Pharis, Harold B Gay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Kevin K. McAleenan, #3 Summons DHS-CBP, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney DC)(Bernstein, Jules) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLACK et al v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A Johnson
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Walsh
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Woodworth
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Bruce Pharis
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Hoxworth
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Hein
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie J Black
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W Dick
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drue B Garrison
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold B Gay
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J Coulon
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E Hunter
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRUE B. GARRISON
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. WALSH
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL J. COULON
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES W. DICK
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD B. GAY
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY E. HUNTER
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK A. JOHNSON
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDDIE J. BLACK
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. HEIN
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. BRUCE PHARIS
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY L. HOXWORTH
Represented By: Jules Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?