CALDERON-LOPEZ v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01851
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password, Order on Motion for Reconsideration by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ (jf)
August 19, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management. (zad)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to be a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for Full Case Management, up to an excluding trial. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/19/2019. (lckbj1)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for CM/ECF Password; granting #6 Motion for Reconsideration (See order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/12/2019. (zsb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order #5 by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ (zmc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that, within 20 days of entry of this Order, the plaintiff either shall provide a full residence address, or shall file a motion to use an alternative address, such as a post office box, as the mailing address. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/08/2019. (zad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ. Case related to Case No. 18-1451. (zrdj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ (zrdj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ (zrdj)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
June 24, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/24/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALDERON-LOPEZ v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO JOSE CALDERON-LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?