August 19, 2019 |
Filing 31
MOTION for Summary Judgment by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A - Order of the Immigration Judge, #4 Exhibit B - Order, Grace v. Whitaker, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Platt, Steven)
|
August 19, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Defendants have served on Plaintiffs an expedited motion for summary judgment in accordance with the Court's #22 Scheduling Order of 7/10/19, consistent with the procedures set forth in the Court's #3 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to APA Cases. (See Certificate of Service, ECF No. 29.) Given the expedited nature of these proceedings, as well as the significant public interest in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the "Batching" requirements contained in Para. 4(a) of this #3 Court's General Order and Guidelines for APA Cases are STRICKEN, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their summary judgment briefs on the docket individually, on or before the deadlines the Court set in the #22 Scheduling Order. Having served their summary judgment motion prior to the instant order, Defendants shall promptly file on the docket the motion for summary judgment, memorandum of law, exhibits thereto, and proposed order that were served on Plaintiffs' counsel on August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/19/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 16, 2019 |
Filing 30
REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Compel filed by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA. (Cox, Justin)
|
August 15, 2019 |
Filing 29
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs. (Platt, Steven)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Filing 28
NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Maria R. Osornio on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Osornio, Maria)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 27
Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION to Compel filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing 26
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Platt on behalf of All Defendants (Platt, Steven)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 25
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 07/09/2019; Page Numbers: 1-25. Date of Issuance: 08/05/2019. Court Reporter Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone number (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 8/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
|
August 5, 2019 |
Filing 24
MOTION to Compel by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin B. Cox, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A - Certification of the Administrative Record, #4 Exhibit B - Letter from Pls' Counsel dated July 29, 2019, #5 Exhibit C - Letter from Pls' Counsel dated July 31, 2019, #6 Exhibit D - Emails from Pls' Counsel dated August 1 & 2, 2019, #7 Exhibit E - Attachment to Pls' Counsel email of August 1, 2019, #8 Exhibit F - Email from Defs' Counsel dated August 2, 2019, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
|
July 25, 2019 |
Filing 23
NOTICE of Filing of Index to Administrative Record by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (Attachments: #1 Certified Index to Administrative Record)(Cirino, Paul)
|
July 11, 2019 |
***Case and documents 1 through 6, 8 through 20, Minute Entries and Orders and 22 Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/11/19. Docket entries 7 and 21 will remain under seal. (ztd)
|
July 11, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c), all ECF filings in this matter have been automatically restricted to prevent remote access by the general public. However, the parties agree that all non-sealed ECF filings in this matter should be unrestricted and remotely available to the public. Accordingly, the court ORDERS that all current and future non-sealed ECF filings be made remotely accessible to members of the public. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/11/2019. (lckbj3)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due by 8/5/2019. Cross Motions due by 9/5/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 9/26/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/10/2019. Motions due by 8/5/2019. Responses due by 8/12/2019 Replies due by 8/16/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 8/15/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/5/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/26/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zgdf)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing 22
SCHEDULING ORDER. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/10/2019. (lckbj3)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing 20
RESPONSE re #19 MOTION for Order Regarding the Administrative Record filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing 19
MOTION for Order Regarding the Administrative Record by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 7/9/2019, in Chambers. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer) (gdf)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Filing 18
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Stay of Removal #13 . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/9/2019. (lckbj3)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Filing 17
REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay the Removal of Plaintiffs Ana & Emma MOTION for Telephone Conference MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA. (Cox, Justin)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Motion(s) terminated: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay the Removal of Plaintiffs Ana & Emma MOTION for Telephone Conference MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, JULIA, ANA, SOFIA, EMMA. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/9/2019. (lckbj1)
|
July 9, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. During this morning's teleconference, Plaintiffs' counsel proposed that the Court require the government to produce an index of any relevant documents that the agency excludes from the administrative record when it undertakes to compile the record in this case. If Plaintiffs intend to pursue this requested order, they must provide proposed language for inclusion in the Court's scheduling order concerning the production of the administrative record, and Defendant must have the opportunity to oppose any such language. Accordingly, and consistent with the representations that the Court made during the teleconference, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/10/19 at 10:00 AM, Plaintiffs shall file any motion for a withholding index or other Court order concerning compilation of the administrative record. Plaintiffs shall provide with their motion the proposed language of the requested order, which shall include deadlines for filings related to disputes regarding the content of the proposed withholding index and any other aspects of the production of the administrative record, and a memorandum of law of no more than 5 pages that identifies the legal authority for the proposed order language. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any response by Defendant to Plaintiffs' motion shall be no more than 5 pages, and shall be filed on or before 7/10/19 at 2 PM. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/9/2019. (lckbj3)
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing 21
SEALED DOCUMENT (Declarations) filed by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, SOFIA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing 16
Memorandum in opposition to re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay the Removal of Plaintiffs Ana & Emma MOTION for Telephone Conference MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Austin, Kathryn)
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing 14
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul)
|
July 8, 2019 |
Filing 13
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay the Removal of Plaintiffs Ana & Emma, MOTION for Telephone Conference , MOTION for Scheduling Order by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & Cox Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
|
July 8, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs have filed an #13 Emergency Motion for an Administrative Stay of Removal, in which Plaintiffs' counsel represents pursuant to LCvR 7(m) that government counsel "ha[s] been unwilling to state their position as to whether the Courts intervention is necessary" to prevent the removal of Plaintiffs Ana and Emma. (See Pls.' Emergency Mot., ECF No. 13, at 2.) Given this representation, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' #13 Emergency Motion at or before 6:30 PM this evening. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic status conference is set for tomorrow, July 9, 2019, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. The Court will provide the conference call call-in information to counsel by email. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/8/2019. (lckbj3, )
|
July 3, 2019 |
Filing 12
ORDER. The Pseudonymous Plaintiffs' motion #7 to proceed under pseudonyms is GRANTED. Consistent with this Order, the Clerk is directed to lodge the declarations attached to Pseudonymous Plaintiffs' motion #7 under seal. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/3/19. (lckbj3)
|
July 2, 2019 |
Filing 11
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/2/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2019.) (Cox, Justin)
|
July 1, 2019 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Appearance by Manoj Govindaiah on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Govindaiah, Manoj)
|
July 1, 2019 |
Filing 9
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN and U.S. Attorney (jf)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 8
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SOFIA, ANA, MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, EMMA, JULIA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Cox, Justin)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 7
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANA, EMMA, JULIA, SOFIA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Decl. of Ana*, #3 Exhibit B - Decl. of Emma*, #4 Exhibit C - Decl. of Sofia*, #5 Exhibit D - Decl. of Julia*, #6 Exhibit E - Grace Pseudonym Opinion, #7 Exhibit F - Damus Pseudonym Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 6
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA, SOFIA, ANA, JULIA, EMMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lesson Plan dated April 30, 2019)(Cox, Justin)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Amended Complaint by MARIA M. KIAKOMBUA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline)(Cox, Justin)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B. Cox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cox, Justin)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 3
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/28/2019. (lckbj1)
|
June 27, 2019 |
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
|
June 27, 2019 |
SUMMONS Not Issued as to WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, JENNIFER HIGGINS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (zsb)
|
June 26, 2019 |
Filing 2
NOTICE of Appearance by Deepa Alagesan on behalf of MARIA KIAKOMBUA (Alagesan, Deepa)
|
June 25, 2019 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6213417) filed by MARIA KIAKOMBUA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hirose, Mariko)
|