INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION et al v. SOUTHERN AIR, INC.
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION and AIRLINE PROFESSIONALS ASSOC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 1224
Defendant: SOUTHERN AIR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01948
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint And Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award MOTION to Vacate filed by SOUTHERN AIR, INC.. (Siegel, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint And Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award MOTION to Vacate filed by AIRLINE PROFESSIONALS ASSOC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 1224, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gleason, Edward)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA (Notice of Errata) re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint And Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award filed by SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Siegel, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Siegel, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Janger on behalf of SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Janger, Rachel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alan Siegel on behalf of SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Siegel, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint And Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award by SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOUTHERN AIR, INC. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019 (Gleason, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SOUTHERN AIR, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/2/2019) (zjd).
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zjd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against SOUTHERN AIR, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6222516) filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION, AIRLINE PROFESSIONALS ASSOC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 1224. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gleason, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION et al v. SOUTHERN AIR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AIRLINE DIVISION
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIRLINE PROFESSIONALS ASSOC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 1224
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN AIR, INC.
Represented By: Rachel S. Janger
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?