GREEN v. HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN et al
Plaintiff: JUDY GREEN
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01962
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JUDY GREEN. HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Berger, Erik)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JUDY GREEN. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Berger, Erik)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Erik W. Berger. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/5/2019. (lccrc1)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erik W. Berger, :Firm- Osterhout Berger Disability Law, :Address- 3744 DuPont Station Court South, Jacksonville, FL 32217. Phone No. - 904-733-2800. Fax No. - 904-733-2805 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6231654. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDY GREEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6226212) filed by JUDY GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Hyatt Corporation Disability Income Insurance Plan, #3 Summons Summons to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY GREEN
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Erik W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYATT CORPORATION GROUP DISABILITY INCOME INSURANCE PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?