COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al Featured Case

The House Committee on Ways and Means filed this lawsuit requesting access to President Donald Trump's tax returns, escalating a battle between the House and the President. The Committee argues that the administration's defiance constitutes "an extraordinary attack on the authority of Congress to obtain information needed to conduct oversight of Treasury, the I.R.S., and the tax laws on behalf of the American people."

Plaintiff: COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CHARLES P. RETTIG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY and STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Petitioner: DUANE MORLEY COX
Intervenor Defendant: DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP and LFB ACQUISITION LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01974
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on 03/05/2020; Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance:06/05/2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenc ed above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2020.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
March 20, 2020 Case Stayed. (hmc)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. This matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/20/2020. (lctnm2)
March 17, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Matz, Joshua)
March 16, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Letter, Douglas)
March 12, 2020 Filing 88 Joint STATUS REPORT by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
March 5, 2020 Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2020. Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Lift Stay, denied as moot. Stay is lifted. Joint Status Report due in one week. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 86 Motion to Vacate Hearing. The hearing remains scheduled for March 5, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/2020. (lctnm2)
March 4, 2020 Filing 87 Memorandum in opposition to re 86 MOTION to Vacate Hearing (Joint Opposition of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
March 4, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Vacate Hearing by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 3/12/2020 (znmw).
March 2, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Morrell on behalf of All Defendants (Morrell, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Committee on the Judiciary v. McGahn)(Myers, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
February 29, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Thomas Norris on behalf of DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., DONALD J. TRUMP (Norris, Cameron)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Lift Stay, on March 5, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2020. (lctnm2)
February 15, 2020 Filing 82 REPLY to opposition to motion re 79 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE re 79 MOTION to Lift Stay of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (status conference transcript), # 2 Exhibit B (correspondence of counsel), # 3 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the 80 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. James Burnham is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/5/2020. (lctnm2)
February 4, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Burnham, James)
January 28, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Lift Stay by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on 1-14-20; Page Numbers: 1-15; Date of Issuance: 1-17-20; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced ab ove. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020.(Miller, Timothy)
January 14, 2020 Case Stayed. (hmc)
January 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2020. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller.) (hmc)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the Telephone Conference on January 14, 2020, this case is hereby STAYED pending a decision in Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives v. McGahn, No. 19-5331 (D.C. Cir.). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2020. (lctnm2)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting a telephone conference for January 14, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2020. (lctnm2)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Mr. Cox's 77 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2019. (lctnm2)
December 3, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE re 75 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors') filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D.C. Circuit Order)(Myers, Steven)
December 2, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re Minute Order filed on 9/12/2019, by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Attachments) (ztth)
November 26, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE re 71 Memorandum (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Mr. Cox's 73 Motion for Leave to File. The time for filing an amicus brief has long since passed. See 9/12/19 Minute Order. While the Court has been liberal in allowing Mr. Cox to supplement his 45 Amicus Brief, the Court believes that yet additional supplements are unnecessary at this time. There shall be no further briefing from Mr. Cox or any other amici in this matter unless otherwise invited by the Court. See LCvR 7(o)(2). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2019. (lctnm2)
November 13, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of intent to respond by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY re 71 Memorandum (Myers, Steven)
November 12, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Recommendations from Hearing) (ztth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 71 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas); Modified text and event on 11/13/2019 (ztth).
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on November 6, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-151. Date of Issuance: November 12, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court rep orter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2020.(Edwards, Lisa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 69 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 65 Amicus Brief, 45 Amicus Brief filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Cox's 68 Motion for Leave to File. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/6/2019. (lctnm2)
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2019 re 44 MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, CHARLES P. RETTIG. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
November 1, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Deepak Gupta on behalf of CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Gupta, Deepak)
October 31, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Supplement to Amicus Pleadings) (ztth)
October 29, 2019 Filing 66 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re Order by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas); Modified event and text on 10/31/2019 (ztth).
October 23, 2019 Filing 65 AMICUS BRIEF by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Cox's 64 Motion for Leave to File Brief. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/23/2019. (lctnm2)
October 22, 2019 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Bernie, Andrew); Modified event and text on 10/23/2019 (ztth).
October 18, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (ztth)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the 62 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Joshua Matz is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Amici Curiae, Constitutional Law Scholars. The Court directs amici's attention to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(1): "An attorney who is a member in good standing of the bar of any United States Court or of the highest court of any State, but who is not a member of the Bar of this Court, may file papers in this Court only if such attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court. All papers submitted by non-members of the Bar of this Court must be signed by such counsel and by a member of the Bar of this Court joined in compliance with this Rule." SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/17/2019. (lctnm2)
October 15, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , by Joshua Matz by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Matz, Joshua)
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors' supplemental brief due by 10/22/2019. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due by 10/29/2019. (hmc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby invited to file supplemental briefing on the 44 Motion to Dismiss, in light of the D.C. Circuit's recent decision in Trump v. Mazars USA, LLP, No. 19-5142, 2019 WL 5089748 (D.C. Cir. Oct. 11, 2019). Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors shall file on or before October 22, 2019. If Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors file separately, their briefs shall not exceed ten pages each. If Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors file jointly, their brief shall not exceed 15 pages. Plaintiff shall file its brief on or before October 29, 2019. Plaintiff's brief shall not exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/15/2019. (lctnm2)
October 3, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE re 57 Amicus Brief, 56 Amicus Brief filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (See Docket Entry 60 to view document). (ztth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 60 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/3/2019. (ztth)
October 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the 44 Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors, on November 6, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/1/2019. (lctnm2)
September 30, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY to opposition to motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' 58 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' forthcoming consolidated Reply Memorandum in support of their Motion to Dismiss may be up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/27/2019. (lctnm2)
September 27, 2019 Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Reply Memorandum on behalf of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors due September 30 by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 57 AMICUS BRIEF by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS. (ztd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 56 AMICUS BRIEF by GERALDINE R. GENNET, KERRY W. KIRCHER, IRVIN B. NATHAN, WILLIAM PITTARD, THOMAS J. SPULAK, CHARLES TIEFER. (ztd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the 52 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Laurence H. Tribe shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
September 20, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Constitutional Law Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laurence H. Tribe, :Firm- Harvard Law School, :Address- 1575 Massachussetts Avenue, Cambridge, MA 02138. Phone No. - 617-495-1767. Fax No. - 617-496-4947 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6391192. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Constitutional Law Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurence H. Tribe, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Lawrence)
September 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by David Hunter Smith on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Smith, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Liu on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Liu, Wendy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Saul Robbins on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Robbins, Lawrence)
September 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion to Dismiss due by 9/23/2019. Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' replies due by 9/30/2019. (hmc)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 46 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order and the Plaintiff's 48 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, it is hereby ordered that both motions are granted. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's opposition to the 44 Motion to Dismiss is due on or before September 23, 2019. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's forthcoming opposition may be up to 65 pages in length. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' replies are due on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/19/2019. (lctnm2)
September 19, 2019 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of filing of Supplemental Declaration of Frederick W. Vaughan by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Frederick W. Vaughan)(Myers, Steven)
September 18, 2019 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) Modified event on 9/19/2019 (znmw).
September 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amicus Brief due by 9/20/2019. (hmc)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Any amicus brief shall be filed on or before September 20, 2019. Any amicus brief shall include a statement certifying that the amicus has attempted not to duplicate arguments presented in a party's brief and shall be no longer than 15 pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/12/19. (lctnm1)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 AMICUS BRIEF by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' 43 Motion to Excuse Filing of a Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. The Defendant is directed to file the certified index with the Court within 7 days of a ruling on the 44 Motion to Dismiss. This Order is without prejudice to the Defendant-Intervenors' ability to file a motion for discovery after the Court's decision on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/09/2019. (lctnm2)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. 1960 House Memo, # 2 Exhibit B. Transcript of Trump v. Committee on Ways and Means, # 3 Declaration of Frederick Vaughan and Exhibits, # 4 Declaration of Sunita Lough and Exhibits, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven); Modified event and text on 9/9/2019 (ztth).
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to excuse filing of certified list of contents of administrative record by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court denied Duane Morley Cox's 10 Motion to Intervene. See Order, ECF No. 39 . Mr. Cox's 42 Motion to Amend his proposed Answer in Intervention therefore is denied as moot. Mr. Cox may, however, file an amicus brief, which shall not exceed fifteen pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/06/2019. (lctnm2)
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amicus brief in support of the Administration or President Trump due by 9/6/2019. Amicus brief in support of the Committee due by 9/20/2019. (hmc)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' 41 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' forthcoming consolidated Memorandum of Law in support of their Motion to Dismiss may be up to 60 pages in length. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/04/2019. (lctnm2)
September 4, 2019 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Any amicus brief in support of the Administration or President Trump shall be filed on or before September 6, 2019. Any amicus brief in support of the Committee shall be filed on or before September 20, 2019. Any amicus brief shall include a statement certifying that the amicus has attempted not to duplicate arguments presented in a party's brief and shall be no longer than 15 pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2019. (lctnm1)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of All Defendants (Bernie, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Intervene. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2019. (lctnm1)
September 3, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Any responsive pleading(s) to the Complaint, by the Administration and President Trump, is due by 9/6/2019. (hmc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment as premature; denying 30 Motion to Expedite; denying 33 Motion to Hold Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance as moot. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/29/2019. (lctnm2)
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 30 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (See Docket Entry 35 to view document). (ztth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to re 33 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's #29 Motion for Summary Judgment is held in abeyance pending the Court's ruling on the #30 Motion to Expedite Consideration of this Case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/21/2019. (lctnm2)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is held in abeyance pending the Court's ruling on the 30 Motion to Expedite Consideration of this Case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/21/2019. (lctnm2)
August 20, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Forthcoming Motion(s) To Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Concurrent Briefing) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Forthcoming Motion(s) To Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Concurrent Briefing) by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of All Defendants (Gilligan, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case, MOTION for Briefing Schedule by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's #28 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's forthcoming Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment may be up to 55 pages in length. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2019. (lctnm2)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's forthcoming Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment may be up to 55 pages in length. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2019. (lctnm2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Clouse, Sarah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Barbero, Megan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Morse, Josephine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Hanner, Brooks)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by DUANE MORLEY COX re 10 MOTION to Intervene. (tth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (tth) Modified event title on 8/14/2019 (znmw).
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of All Defendants (Orloff, Serena)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Duane Morley Cox filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Myers, Steven)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Intervene. Upon consideration of the Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' #12 Motion to Intervene, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. The Clerk of Court shall add the movants as Intervenor-Defendants to the case. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/18/2019. (lctnm2)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP. (Consovoy, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., THE DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Consovoy on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP, THE DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER (Consovoy, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 7/10/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHARLES P. RETTIG served on 7/9/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEVEN T. MNUCHIN served on 7/10/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/9/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/10/2019. (Letter, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Answer in Intervention, #2 Exhibit - Notice of Appearance, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2019. (Letter, Douglas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/03/2019. (lctnm2)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(Letter, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons)(Letter, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Sarah Edith Clouse
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Brooks McKinly Hanner
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES P. RETTIG
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP.
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DJT HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DTTM OPERATIONS LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP.
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: LFB ACQUISITION LLC
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DUANE MORLEY COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?