KOVACS et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRU KOVACS, MIHAELA APETREI and BEATICE KOVACS
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv02000
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the Court's Minute Order of July 23, 2019 and the #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2019. (lcegs3)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES Substituting for attorney Melanie Hendry (Moustakas, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MIHAELA APETREI, BEATICE KOVACS, ALEXANDRU KOVACS (Piston, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the status conference held on July 23, 2019, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to a motion for reconsideration for good cause shown. In view of #7 Defendant's Notice of Filing of Documents, the Court finds as moot #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/23/2019. (lcegs3)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Referenced During July 23, 2019 Status Conference by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Hendry, Melanie)
July 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 7/23/2019. Based Upon Representations Made By The Defendant, The Plaintiff Moves To Dismiss The Case. The Court Will Dismiss This Case Pending A Motion For Reconsideration. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Hendry, Melanie)
July 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Government Opposition Brief due by 7/24/2019. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 7/26/2019. (mac)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules the motion hearing for July 30, 2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: (1) the government shall file its opposition brief by no later than noon on July 24, 2019; and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief by no later than noon on July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2019. (lcegs3)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a status conference for July 23, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 24A. Plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia and/or the United States Department of Homeland Security as appropriate to identify government counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2019. (lcegs3)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall refile the #1 Complaint, removing the full name of the minor child and replacing the name of the minor child with her initials, by no later than July 23, 2019. Plaintiffs shall file a redacted version of the #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, removing the personal identifiers contained in the motion, [5-3] Exhibit A, [5-4] Exhibit B, and [5-5] Exhibit C, by no later than July 23, 2019. See Local Civil Rule 5.4(f) (1)-(4). The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the #1 Complaint and #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk of Court is further directed to remove the minor child from the caption and replace her name with her initials. Plaintiffs' counsel shall comply with the Local Civil Rules of this Court for all future filings. See Standing Order, ECF No. 3 at 1 1. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2019. (lcegs3) Modified on 7/19/2019 (lcegs3).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MIHAELA APETREI, BEATICE KOVACS, ALEXANDRU KOVACS (Attachments: #1 Statement of Points and Authorities (1), #2 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit A. Parole Documents, #4 Exhibit B. Asylum Documents, #5 Exhibit C. Medical Documents, #6 Exhibit D. Employment Authorization Denial, #7 Exhibit E. Declaration of Alexandru Kovacs, #8 Exhibit F. Notice to Appear, #9 Exhibit G. Table of Exhibits)(Piston, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #2 MOTION to Issue Summons was entered in error and summons will be issued by the clerk's office as part of the case opening procedure.(jf)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/15/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Issue Summons by MIHAELA APETREI, BEATICE KOVACS, ALEXANDRU KOVACS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael) Modified on 7/15/2019 (zjf).
July 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6235070) filed by ALEXANDRU KOVACS, BEATICE KOVACS, MIHAELA APETREI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Piston, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOVACS et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRU KOVACS
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIHAELA APETREI
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEATICE KOVACS
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Represented By: John Moustakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?