GRAY v. WALTER REED NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. GRAY, III
Defendant: MERIT SYSTEMS PROTECTION BOARD, WALTER REED NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE 1 and U.S. EQUAL OPPERTUNITY EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02006
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his residential address with the clerk's office by 9/5/2019. (znbn)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Use P.O. Box. Plaintiff shall file, no later than September 5, 2019, his residential address with the clerk's office and it shall be placed under seal. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/26/2019. (lcrcl2)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MERIT SYSTEMS PROTECTION BOARD served on 8/14/2019; U.S. EQUAL OPPERTUNITY EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION served on 8/14/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2019.) (jf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE 1 served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (jf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Use P.O. Box by WILLIAM T. GRAY, III (zmc)
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc)
August 12, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616100158. (zmc)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that within 30 days from the filing date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file an amended IFP application that completely addresses question two or tender the $400 filing fee applicable to civil actions. In addition, Plaintiff shall file either an amended complain listing his full residence address or a separate motion setting forth reason to use a P.O. Box address. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/30/2019. (zmc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM T. GRAY, III (zrdj)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE 1, MERIT SYSTEMS PROTECTION BOARD, U.S. EQUAL OPPERTUNITY EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION, WALTER REED NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER with Jury Demand filed by WILLIAM T. GRAY, III.(zrdj)
July 5, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. WALTER REED NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIT SYSTEMS PROTECTION BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER REED NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. EQUAL OPPERTUNITY EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. GRAY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?