RICHMOND-HOWARD v. SAUL
Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE RICHMOND-HOWARD
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02014
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General /8/19/19. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #7 to view.
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SHEILA MARIE RICHMOND-HOWARD.(Osterhout, Karl)
July 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/24/2019. (zeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SHEILA MARIE RICHMOND-HOWARD. (zjd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL filed by SHEILA MARIE RICHMOND-HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(zjd)
July 3, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/3/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to plaintiff's counsel of record. (zjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHMOND-HOWARD v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE RICHMOND-HOWARD
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?