MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02024
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff established that good cause exists for it to serve a third-party subpoena on Verizon Fios, John Doe Defendant's Internet Service Provider ("ISP"). See, e.g., Arista Records LLC v. Does 1-19, 551 F. Supp. 2d 1, 6-7 (D.D.C. 2008); Warner Bros. Records Inc. v. Does 16, 527 F. Supp. 2d 1, 2 (D.D.C. 2007). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Minute Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any service provider that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the ISP qualifies as a "cable operator," as defined by 47 U.S.C. 522(5), it shall comply with 47 U.S.C. 551(c)(2)(B), by sending a copy of this Minute Order to the Defendant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed in response to a Rule 45 subpoena served on the ISP for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff's rights as set forth in its Complaint. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/23/2019. (lcegs3)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/17/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
July 9, 2019 Payment for #1 Complaint. ($400; Receipt number 0090-6241028). (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC re #1 Complaint (Hoppe, Jon) Modified event title on 7/18/2019 (znmw).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Jon A. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?